VA SB163 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0614)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0614)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Historical African American cemeteries and graves; Loudoun County; Belmont. Adds the African-American Burial Ground for the Enslaved at Belmont in Loudoun County, which cemetery contains 44 eligible graves, to the list of those cemeteries for which qualified charitable organizations may receive funds from the Department of Historic Resources for the care of historical African American cemeteries and graves.
Title
Historical African American cemeteries and graves; adds cemetery at Belmont in Loudoun County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0614) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 614 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB163ER) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB163ER) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB163S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106342D-S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106342D-S1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100973D |