VA SB1613 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Driver's license suspensions for certain non-driving related offenses. Removes the existing provisions that allow a person's driver's license to be suspended (i) when he is convicted of or placed on deferred disposition for a drug offense and (ii) for violations not pertaining to the operator or operation of a motor vehicle. The provisions of the bill are contingent upon funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Driver's license; suspensions for certain non-driving related offenses, effective clause.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. John Petersen [D] | Sen. William Stanley [R] | Sen. David Suetterlein [R] |
Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19103734D-E |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1613E |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103734D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 251 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 259.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1200.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 390.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 395 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 410.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |