VA SB1611 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health care shared savings; incentive programs. Requires health carriers to establish a comparable health care service incentive program under which savings are shared with a covered person who elects to receive a covered comparable health care service from a lower-cost provider. Incentive payments are not required for savings of $25 or less. The measure requires health carriers to comply with transparency requirements beginning with health benefit plans offered or renewed on or after July 1, 2020. Programs are required to be approved by the Commissioner of Insurance. This bill is identical to HB 2639.
Title
Health care shared savings; incentive programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 684 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1611ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with amendments (95-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1611S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106179D-S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106179D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104163D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3461 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3465 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2910.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |