VA SB161 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; heat-related illness; guidelines. Directs the Department of Education, in conjunction with stakeholders, to develop guidelines on policies to inform and educate coaches and student athletes and their parents or guardians of the nature and risk of heat-related illness, how to recognize the signs of heat-related illness, and how to prevent heat-related illness to be distributed to local school divisions by August 1, 2022.
Title
Heat-related illness; DOE to develop guidelines on policies to inform & educate coaches & athletes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (84-Y 15-N) (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 428 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB161ER) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (84-Y 15-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed House (84-Y 15-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-28 | House | Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101762D |