VA SB1602 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reports to Central Criminal Record Exchange; duties and authority of the Central Criminal Records Exchange; unapplied criminal history record information. Requires the Central Criminal Records Exchange (Exchange) to review offenses containing unapplied criminal history record information, defined in the bill, and make reasonable efforts to ensure that such information is applied to criminal history records. The bill requires the Exchange to submit periodic reports to the Office of the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia, the clerk of each circuit court and district court, attorneys for the Commonwealth, and law-enforcement agencies containing (i) a list of offenses with unapplied criminal history record information and (ii) for each offense, if known, the name and any other identifying information of the defendant, any identifying court case information, the date of submission to the Exchange, and the reason the offense could not be applied to the criminal history record. The bill also requires the Exchange to submit an annual report to the Governor and General Assembly on the status of unapplied criminal history record information and any updates to fingerprinting policies and procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Central Criminal Records Exchange; reports, duties and authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 782 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1602ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-21SenateTitle replaced 19106508D-H1
2019-02-21SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1602H1
2019-02-20HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106508D-H1
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106508D-H1
2019-02-15HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenatePrinted as engrossed 19105624D-ES1
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1602ES1
2019-02-05SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-05SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to19105624D-S1
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-23SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105624D-S1
2019-01-23SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104081D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182251(n/a)See Bill Text
18257.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192232(n/a)See Bill Text
192303(n/a)See Bill Text
192303.02(n/a)See Bill Text
192303.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192305.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192388(n/a)See Bill Text
192390(n/a)See Bill Text
192390.03(n/a)See Bill Text
192392(n/a)See Bill Text
19274(n/a)See Bill Text
531145(n/a)See Bill Text
53123(n/a)See Bill Text
91101(n/a)See Bill Text
91176.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1602
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1602+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1602S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1602ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1602H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1602ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0782+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0143+SB1602
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0254+SB1602
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1602+SB1602
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0415SB1602+SB1602
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0416SB1602+SB1602
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0140+SB1602
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0348+SB1602
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3108+SB1602
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0944SB1602+SB1602

Bill Comments

feedback