VA SB1596 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; payments made on behalf of enrollee. Requires any carrier issuing a health plan in the Commonwealth to count any payments made by another person on the enrollee's behalf, as well as payments made by the enrollee, when calculating the enrollee's overall contribution to any out-of-pocket maximum or any cost-sharing requirement under the carrier's health plan. This bill is identical to HB 2515.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health plans; calculation of enrollee's contribution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (90-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1596ER)
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled
2019-02-15SenateTitle replaced 19106580D-H1
2019-02-15SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (90-Y 5-N 1-A)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute (90-Y 5-N 1-A)
2019-02-13HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1596H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106580D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106580D-H1
2019-02-12HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102900D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823407.20(n/a)See Bill Text
3824214(n/a)See Bill Text
3824319(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1596
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1596+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1596H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1596ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0091+SB1596
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0313SB1596+SB1596
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0347SB1596+SB1596
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0348SB1596+SB1596
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0174+SB1596
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2768+SB1596
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2790+SB1596
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0691SB1596+SB1596

Bill Comments

feedback