VA SB1593 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Delegates: Rush, Austin, Torian
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

State Council of Higher Education for Virginia; financial aid award notification. Requires any comprehensive financial aid award notification provided to a student by a public institution of higher education or private institution of higher education to meet the requirements and best practices established by the Council in its Financial Aid Award Letters Policies and Guidance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHEV; financial aid award notification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseDelegates: Rush, Austin, Torian
2019-02-20HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-19SenateSenators: Dunnavant, Peake, Howell
2019-02-19SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-19SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-18HouseHouse insisted on amendment
2019-02-15SenateHouse amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-13HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-06HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenatePrinted as engrossed 19102482D-E
2019-01-21SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1593E
2019-01-21SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-21SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-21SenateRead second time
2019-01-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102482D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231611.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1593
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1593+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1593E+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0071+SB1593
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0087SB1593+SB1593
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0122SB1593+SB1593
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0120+SB1593
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0178+SB1593
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2725+SB1593
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0690SB1593+SB1593
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0812SB1593+SB1593

Bill Comments

feedback