VA SB1592 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; certification of certain small businesses. Directs the Director of the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity to amend its regulation regarding the certification of businesses as any subcategory of small businesses established as part of an enhancement or remedial measure authorized by the Governor to provide that a business that is certified as any subcategory of small business pursuant to the small business certification program administered by the Director may be certified using full-time equivalents to determine the number of employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business and Supplier Diversity, Department of; certification of a small business.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 20-N) (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03SenateCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 20-N)
2019-03-26SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1592ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with amendments (82-Y 17-N)
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-19HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenatePrinted as engrossed 19101943D-E
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1592E
2019-01-31SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-31SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101943D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1592
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1592+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1592E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1592ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0080+SB1592
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1592+SB1592
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0300SB1592+SB1592
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1104V0034+SB1592
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0275+SB1592
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3032+SB1592
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0880SB1592+SB1592
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1144SB1592+SB1592

Bill Comments

feedback