VA SB1590 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; coverage for autism spectrum disorder. Requires health insurers, health care subscription plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorder in individuals from age two through age 12. Currently, such coverage is required to be provided for individuals from age two through age 10. The provision applies with respect to insurance policies, subscription contracts, and health care plans delivered, issued for delivery, reissued, or extended on or after January 1, 2018.
Title
Health insurance; coverage for autism spectrum disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17104450D-E |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1590E |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (8-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17104450D |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Unanimous consent to introduce |