VA SB1588 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sale of surplus property from the General Assembly Building replacement project; emergency. Requires the Department of General Services to conduct public sales or auctions of the surplus property, as defined in the bill, from the General Assembly Building replacement project. No provision of law shall be construed to restrict the purchase by any person of the surplus property at a public sale or auction. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
General Assembly Building replacement project; sale of surplus property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 637 (effective 3/20/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1588ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17104581D-E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1588E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 17104581D |