VA SB1587 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; wine and beer licenses. Includes Alleghany County in the list of wine and beer licenses that may be granted to persons operating food concessions at any outdoor performing arts amphitheater, arena, or similar facility that has seating for more than 20,000 persons.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; wine and beer licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 745 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1587ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title replaced 17105260D-H1 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1587H1 |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105260D-H1 |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105260D-H1 |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17104513D |