VA SB1585 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - VOTE: DEFEATED (46-Y 54-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - VOTE: DEFEATED (46-Y 54-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Form of ballot; party identification of candidates. Provides that any candidate nominated by a political party or at a primary election shall be identified on the ballot by the name of his political party. Currently, only candidates for federal, statewide, and General Assembly offices are so identified.
Title
Form of ballot; party identification of candidates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (46-Y 54-N) (Y: 46 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (46-Y 54-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Defeated by House (44-Y 54-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Amendment by Delegate Minchew agreed to |
2017-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17100425D |