VA SB1583 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0255)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0255)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Teacher licensure; career and technical education; certain local waivers. Permits each local school board or division superintendent to waive certain enumerated licensure requirements for any individual whom it seeks to employ as a career and technical education teacher and who is also seeking initial licensure or renewal of a license with an endorsement in the area of career and technical education. This bill is identical to HB 1770.
Title
Teacher licensure; career and technical education, certain local waivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 29-N) (Y: 66 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 29-N) (Y: 66 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0255) | |
2017-02-24 | House | Enacted, Chapter 255 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1583ER2) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Passed by until after the first recess |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2017-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/14/17 |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1583ER) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 29-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed House (66-Y 29-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported from Education (15-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1583S2 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Suetterlein agreed to 17105001D-S2 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 17104832D-S1 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 17105001D-S2 (Suetterlein) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Incorporates SB1162 (Reeves) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104832D-S1 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17104199D |