VA SB1579 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Standards and criteria for congressional and state legislative districts. Provides criteria by which congressional and state legislative districts are to be drawn, including equal population, racial and ethnic fairness, respect for existing political boundaries, contiguity, compactness, and communities of interest. The criteria set out would apply to those districts drawn following the 2020 United States Census and thereafter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congressional and state legislative districts; standards and criteria.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 46-N) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1579ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 46-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House (53-Y 46-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2019-02-04HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2019-01-25SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101768D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242304.04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback