VA SB1571 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Special elections; provisional ballots; determination of results. Provides that in the case of a special election, the local electoral boards shall ascertain the results of the election, make out the abstract of votes, and make out the certificate of election regardless of any provisional ballots whose validity is yet to be determined, unless the number of outstanding provisional ballots is sufficient to change the outcome of the election. The bill requires the State Board of Elections to ascertain the results of the special election in the same manner. The bill also provides that in the case of special elections, the local electoral boards shall meet to process the provisional ballots regardless of any state or federal holiday.
Title
Special elections; provisional ballots, determination of results.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17104129D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 653 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 671 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 675 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 676 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 679 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |