VA SB1570 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-01 - Stricken at request of Patron in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-01 - Stricken at request of Patron in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Adult protective services; central registry. Creates a central registry of founded complaints of adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation to be maintained by the State Department of Social Services. The bill establishes (i) investigation requirements for local departments of social services related to complaints of adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation; (ii) record retention and disclosure requirements for the Department and local departments; (iii) notice requirements related to findings by local departments and central registry entries; and (iv) an appeals process to contest the findings of a local department related to founded reports of adult abuse, neglect, or exploitation.
Title
Adult protective services; creates central registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | Senate | Stricken at request of Patron in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102290D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1605.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1610.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1610.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |