VA SB1568 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; training requirement for barbers and cosmetologists. Prohibits the Board for Barbers and Cosmetology from requiring, as a condition of licensure that an applicant for a license to practice barbering or cosmetology complete more than 1,000 hours of training in the field for which the applicant seeks licensure.
Title
Barbers and cosmetologists; requirement for completion of hours of training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19102111D-E |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1568E |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102111D |