VA SB1561 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Education; sixth grade science curriculum. Directs the Department of Education to coordinate with the Department of Environmental Quality to update the "Window into a Green Virginia" curriculum developed by the Departments for sixth grade science to include a unit on the benefits, including the energy benefits, of recycling and reuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sixth grade science; Department of Education, et al., shall update curriculum.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 12-N) (Y: 10 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseFailed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 12-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
2019-02-11HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenatePrinted as engrossed 19103236D-E
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1561E
2019-02-05SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-05SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103236D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback