VA SB1559 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

C-PACE loans; resiliency improvements. Authorizes any locality, by ordinance, to authorize contracts to provide loans for the initial acquisition and installation of resiliency improvements, including improvements for the mitigation of flooding or the impacts of flooding or stormwater management improvements with a preference for natural or nature-based features and living shorelines with free and willing property owners of both existing properties and new construction. Current law authorizes such contracts only for clean energy improvements. Such ordinance shall include (i) a minimum and maximum aggregate dollar amount that may be financed with respect to a property and (ii) if a locality or other public body is originating the loan, a maximum aggregate dollar amount that may be financed with respect to loans originated by the locality or other public body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

C-PACE loans; shoreline resiliency improvements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 753 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1559ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1559S1
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106110D-S1
2019-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-01SenateRead second time
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106110D-S1
2019-01-29SenateReported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102285D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152958.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1559
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1559+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1559S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1559ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0753+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0054+SB1559
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1559+SB1559
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0320SB1559+SB1559
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0702V0029+SB1559
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H07V0087+SB1559
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2957+SB1559
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3000+SB1559

Bill Comments

feedback