VA SB1557 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Signed by Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Board of Pharmacy; cannabidiol oil and tetrahydrocannabinol oil; regulation of pharmaceutical processors. Authorizes licensed physician assistants and licensed nurse practitioners to issue a written certification for use of cannabidiol oil and THC-A oil. The bill requires the Board to promulgate regulations establishing dosage limitations, which shall require that each dispensed dose of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil not exceed 10 milligrams of tetrahydrocannabinol. The bill requires the Secretary of Health and Human Resources and the Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry to convene a work group to review and recommend an appropriate structure for an oversight organization for the medical marijuana program in Virginia and report its findings and recommendations to the Chairmen of the Senate Committees on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources and Education and Health and the House Committees on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources and Health, Welfare and Institutions by November 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy, Board of; cannabidiol oil and tetrahydrocannabinol oil, regulation of pharmaceutical.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1557ER)
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled
2019-02-15SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-13HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N)
2019-02-06HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1557S1
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105737D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-28SenateRead second time
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105737D-S1
2019-01-24SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102904D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413408.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1557
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1557+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1557S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1557ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0107+SB1557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0196SB1557+SB1557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0221SB1557+SB1557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1203V0025+SB1557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0146+SB1557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2723+SB1557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0688SB1557+SB1557

Bill Comments

feedback