VA SB1554 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-25 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-25 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation district commissions; Accomack-Northampton Transportation District Commission. Provides that the membership of the Accomack-Northampton Transportation District Commission shall consist of nine nonlegislative citizen members appointed by the Governor, subject to confirmation by the General Assembly and serving at the pleasure of the Governor, including two members of the Accomack County Board of Supervisors, two members of the Northampton County Board of Supervisors, and five members representing local businesses. The Director of the Department of Rail and Public Transit, or his designee, shall serve ex officio with voting privileges.
Title
Accomack-Northampton Transportation District Commission; membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-25 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2017-02-25 | Senate | No further action taken |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (8-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17104082D |