VA SB1552 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0167)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0167)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Ballots; number ordered to be printed. Requires the general registrars to consider the number of active registered voters and historical election data, including voter turnout, when determining the number of ballots to order to be printed for an election. This bill is identical to HB 2415.
Title
Ballots; number ordered to be printed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0167) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 167 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1552ER) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17104179D-E |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1552E |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17104179D |