VA SB1546 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Health; definition of restaurant; emergency. Adds any place or operation that prepares or stores food for distribution to child or adult day care centers or schools, regardless of whether the receiving day care center or school holds a restaurant license, to the definition of "restaurant" as it applies to Title 35.1 (Hotels, Restaurants, Summer Camps, and Campgrounds). The bill has an emergency clause. Department of Health; definition of restaurant; emergency. Adds any place or operation that prepares or stores food for distribution to child or adult day care centers or schools, regardless of whether the receiving day care center or school holds a restaurant license, to the definition of "restaurant" as it applies to Title 35.1 (Hotels, Restaurants, Summer Camps, and Campgrounds). The bill has an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restaurants; clarifies definition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342)
2023-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 342 (effective 3/23/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-24SenateSigned by President
2023-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1546ER)
2023-02-24SenateEnrolled
2023-02-21HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-21HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-21HouseRead third time
2023-02-20HouseRead second time
2023-02-16HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2023-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-02-13HouseRead first time
2023-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-06SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1546S1
2023-02-06SenateEmergency clause added
2023-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to
2023-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-06SenateRead second time
2023-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2023-02-02SenateCommittee substitute printed 23105992D-S1
2023-02-02SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2023-01-27SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2023-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2023-01-26SenatePresented and ordered printed 23105055D
2023-01-26SenateUnanimous consent to introduce

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
325130(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1546
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1546+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1546S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1546ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0342+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105992D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1546F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1546FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1546FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S04V0137+SB1546
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0241SB1546+SB1546
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0276SB1546+SB1546
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0277SB1546+SB1546
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H12V0228+SB1546
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2094+SB1546

Bill Comments

feedback