VA SB1540 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Protective orders; contents of preliminary protective orders; docketing of appeal. Provides that if a preliminary protective order is issued in an ex parte hearing where the petition for the order is supported by sworn testimony and not an affidavit or a form completed by a law-enforcement officer that includes a statement of the grounds for the order, the court issuing the order shall state in the order the basis on which the order was entered, including a summary of the allegations made and the court's findings. The bill also requires that an appeal of a permanent protective order be docketed within two business days of receipt of such appeal. Under current law, such appeals are to be given precedence on the docket of the court over other civil appeals but otherwise docketed and processed in the same manner as other civil cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protective orders; contents of preliminary orders, docketing of appeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 718 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1540ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1540S1
2019-01-23SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105431D-S1
2019-01-23SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-23SenateRead second time
2019-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105431D-S1
2019-01-21SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104061D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161112(n/a)See Bill Text
161253.1(n/a)See Bill Text
161296(n/a)See Bill Text
192152.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1540
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1540+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1540S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1540ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0718+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0102+SB1540
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0134SB1540+SB1540
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0158SB1540+SB1540
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0086+SB1540
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0369+SB1540
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3130+SB1540

Bill Comments

feedback