VA SB154 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Administrative Process Act; hearing officers; timely decisions. Provides that a hearing officer conducting a formal hearing on behalf of an agency shall render a recommendation or conclusion within the time period specified in such agency's written regulations or procedures. If the agency does not have regulations or procedures specifying a time period, the recommendation or conclusion must be rendered by the hearing officer within 90 days. This bill is the recommendation of the Administrative Law Advisory Committee and has been approved by the Virginia Code Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative Process Act; hearing officers, timely decisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 613 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB154ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseRead third time
2018-03-05HouseRead second time
2018-03-01HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-26SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2017-12-28SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-12-28SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101264D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224024(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback