VA SB1535 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real Estate Appraiser Board; evaluations. Allows a licensed residential real estate appraiser, certified residential real estate appraiser, or certified general real estate appraiser to provide an evaluation of real estate or real property in connection with certain real estate-related financial transactions. This bill is identical to HB 1556.
Title
Real estate appraisers; exemptions from licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269) | |
2017-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 269 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17 |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1535ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1535S1 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104906D-S1 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104906D-S1 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17104231D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2101.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |