VA SB153 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; form of ballot; order of independent candidates. Defines "time of filing for the office" for purposes of determining the order on the ballot of independent candidates as the time at which the candidate has filed his petition signature pages with a number of signatures at least equal to the number required by law for the office for which he is seeking election. For offices for which no petition is required, the "time of filing for the office" is defined as the time at which the candidate has filed his completed statement of qualification.
Title
Independent candidates; clarification of definition of "time of filing for the office."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N 1-A) (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (10-Y 7-N) (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (6-Y 16-N) (Y: 6 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N 1-A) (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (10-Y 7-N) (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (6-Y 16-N) (Y: 6 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 537 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB153ER) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N 1-A) |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed House with amendment (86-Y 10-N 1-A) |
2018-03-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-03-08 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-07 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-05 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (10-Y 7-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Reconsidered by Privileges and Elections |
2018-03-02 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (6-Y 16-N) |
2018-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Printed as reengrossed 18102930D-E2 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reengrossed by Senate as amended SB153E2 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Amendments #4, #5 by Senator Surovell agreed to |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Amendments #1,#2,#3 by Senator Surovell withdrawn |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18102930D-E |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB153E |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 1-N) |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102930D |