VA SB1529 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reports to Central Criminal Records Exchange; additional offenses. Adds several criminal offenses to the list of offenses for which a report to the Central Criminal Records Exchange is required. The reports contain such information as is required by the Exchange and are accompanied by fingerprints of the individual arrested. The bill as introduced was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Central Criminal Records Exchange; reports, adds additional offenses to list.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
2019-02-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 115 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019
2019-02-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019
2019-02-13SenateSigned by President
2019-02-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1529ER)
2019-02-12SenateEnrolled
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-06HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenatePrinted as engrossed 19104226D-E
2019-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1529E
2019-02-01SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-01SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-01SenateRead second time
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-28SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104226D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192390(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1529
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1529+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1529E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1529ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0115+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0171+SB1529
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0195+SB1529
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1529+SB1529
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0320SB1529+SB1529
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0316+SB1529
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2630+SB1529

Bill Comments

feedback