VA SB1524 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Virginia Beach; vacancies in office of council member and mayor. Alters the process for filling vacancies in the office of council member and mayor in the City of Virginia Beach by replacing council appointments with special elections. Charter; City of Virginia Beach; vacancies in office of council member and mayor. Alters the process for filling vacancies in the office of council member and mayor in the City of Virginia Beach by replacing council appointments with special elections.
Title
Virginia Beach, City of; amending charter, vacancies in office of council member and mayor.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Rouse [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1524S1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105241D-S1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105241D-S1 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Local Government |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 23104514D |