VA SB1519 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; Virginia College Public institutions of higher education; Virginia College Savings Plan; renamed Commonwealth Savers Plan; duties of governing board. Renames the Virginia College Savings Plan as the Commonwealth Savers Plan (the Plan) and amends all relevant references to "college savings trust account" to "education savings trust account." The bill provides that the purpose of the Plan is to enhance the accessibility, affordability, and attainability of higher education in the Commonwealth. The bill expands the duties of the governing board (the board) of the Plan to include developing, implementing, and funding programs or partnerships to enhance the accessibility, affordability, and attainability of higher education for underserved and underrepresented communities and students and authorizes the board to develop policies for the funding and review of such programs or partnerships. The bill expands the definition of "current obligations of the Plan" to include any additional benefit or educational access, affordability, and attainability program or partnership developed pursuant to the Plan. The bill further prohibits any officer, director, or member of the board or of any advisory committee to the board from being held personally liable for any loss suffered by the Plan. Finally, the bill provides that any benefit paid on any prepaid tuition contract entered into prior to July 1, 2019, may be supplemented by an additional benefit, subject to the determination and discretion of the board. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia College Savings Plan; renamed Commonwealth Savers Plan, duties of governing board, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07SenateFailed to pass in Senate
2023-02-07SenateNo further action taken
2023-02-07SenatePassed by for the day
2023-02-06SenatePassed by for the day
2023-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1519S1
2023-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23106338D-S1
2023-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-06SenateRead second time
2023-02-06SenatePassed by for the day
2023-02-06SenateFloor substitute printed 23106360D-S2 (Surovell)
2023-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2023-02-02SenateCommittee substitute printed 23106338D-S1
2023-02-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
2023-02-02SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2023-02-02SenateReported from Education and Health (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
2023-01-27SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2023-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2023-01-20SenatePresented and ordered printed 23104313D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222744(n/a)See Bill Text
222753(n/a)See Bill Text
222905(n/a)See Bill Text
223114(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.4(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.7(n/a)See Bill Text
223711(n/a)See Bill Text
224006(n/a)See Bill Text
224343(n/a)See Bill Text
2311004(n/a)See Bill Text
231306(n/a)See Bill Text
231700(n/a)See Bill Text
231701(n/a)See Bill Text
231704(n/a)See Bill Text
231707(n/a)See Bill Text
511505.01(n/a)See Bill Text
581322.02(n/a)See Bill Text
581322.03(n/a)See Bill Text
581344.4(n/a)See Bill Text
801424(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback