VA SB1519 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0600)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0600)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
University of Virginia's College at Wise; reduced rate tuition. Permits the board of visitors of the University of Virginia to charge reduced rate tuition to any student enrolled at the University of Virginia's College at Wise who resides in the Appalachian Region as defined in relevant federal law, is domiciled in the Appalachian Region, and is entitled to in-state tuition charges at a public institution of higher education in the Appalachian Region provided such entitlement is based on circumstances that when applied to a student who resides in Virginia would result in entitlement to in-state tuition. The bill prohibits the board of visitors from setting such reduced rate below the in-state tuition rate for Virginia students attending the University of Virginia's College at Wise. The bill contains an emergency clause and is identical to HB 1666.
Title
University of Virginia's College at Wise; reduced rate tuition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0600) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 600 (effective 3/18/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1519ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-20 | House | Delegates: Kilgore, Rush, Hayes |
2019-02-20 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senators: Carrico, Cosgrove, Barker |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-18 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1519H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106686D-H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106686D-H1 |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1519S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106016D-S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106016D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/19 19101886D |