VA SB1518 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Charitable gaming; Texas Hold'em poker tournaments. Amends the definition of "Texas Hold'em poker tournament" to include an organized competition of players who (i) pay an initial seating fee for entry into the competition and an additional seating fee up to once every 30 minutes, thereby allowing such players to purchase additional poker chips as needed for use in the competition, and (ii) may be seated at no more than 4 tables consisting of 10 players each simultaneously playing Texas Hold'em poker games. The bill prohibits a qualified organization from charging any initial or additional seating fee in excess of $8 for the conduct of any such Texas Hold'em poker tournament and requires qualified organizations to hire a security officer that is licensed by the Department of Criminal Justice Services to be present during the times that any tournament is being played. The bill also requires any qualified organization that conducts any Texas Hold'em poker tournament to use at least 30 percent of its gross receipts from the conduct of Texas Hold'em poker tournaments for (a) those lawful religious, charitable, community, or educational purposes for which the organization is specifically chartered or organized or (b) those expenses related to the acquisition, construction, maintenance, or repair of any interest in real property involved in the operation of the organization and used for lawful religious, charitable, community, or educational purposes. This bill requires any qualified organization that conducts any Texas Hold'em poker tournament to certify that any individual acting as a dealer is 21 years of age or older and defines the required knowledge and skill for such individuals. The bill also requires any qualified organization that conducts any Texas Hold'em poker tournament to appoint a game manager and post a sign in a conspicuous location at the place where the organization collects of money for chips or seating fees, stating that the game manager is present and outlining the game manager's responsibilities. Charitable gaming; Texas Hold'em poker tournaments. Amends the definition of "Texas Hold'em poker tournament" to include an organized competition of players who (i) pay an initial seating fee for entry into the competition and an additional seating fee up to once every 30 minutes, thereby allowing such players to purchase additional poker chips as needed for use in the competition, and (ii) may be seated at no more than 4 tables consisting of 10 players each simultaneously playing Texas Hold'em poker games. The bill prohibits a qualified organization from charging any initial or additional seating fee in excess of $8 for the conduct of any such Texas Hold'em poker tournament and requires qualified organizations to hire a security officer that is licensed by the Department of Criminal Justice Services to be present during the times that any tournament is being played. The bill also requires any qualified organization that conducts any Texas Hold'em poker tournament to use at least 30 percent of its gross receipts from the conduct of Texas Hold'em poker tournaments for (a) those lawful religious, charitable, community, or educational purposes for which the organization is specifically chartered or organized or (b) those expenses related to the acquisition, construction, maintenance, or repair of any interest in real property involved in the operation of the organization and used for lawful religious, charitable, community, or educational purposes. This bill requires any qualified organization that conducts any Texas Hold'em poker tournament to certify that any individual acting as a dealer is 21 years of age or older and defines the required knowledge and skill for such individuals. The bill also requires any qualified organization that conducts any Texas Hold'em poker tournament to appoint a game manager and post a sign in a conspicuous location at the place where the organization collects of money for chips or seating fees, stating that the game manager is present and outlining the game manager's responsibilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charitable gaming; amends definition of Texas Hold'em poker tournaments, bingo games.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 16-N 3-A) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-22HouseLeft in General Laws
2023-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
2023-02-13HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2023-02-09HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2023-02-09HouseRead first time
2023-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-07SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 16-N 3-A)
2023-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1518S1
2023-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23106136D-S1
2023-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-06SenateRead second time
2023-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2023-02-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N 1-A)
2023-02-01SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2023-02-01SenateCommittee substitute printed 23106136D-S1
2023-02-01SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (11-Y 3-N)
2023-01-24SenateAssigned GL&T sub: Gaming
2023-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2023-01-20SenatePresented and ordered printed 23104869D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182340.16(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.19(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.28:2(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.33(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1518
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1518+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1518S1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105576A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1518F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1518FS1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S12V0087+SB1518
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S05V0243+SB1518
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0243SB1518+SB1518
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0357SB1518+SB1518
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H1103V0023+SB1518

Bill Comments

feedback