VA SB1516 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; dyslexia advisor. Requires one reading specialist employed by each local school board that employs a reading specialist to have training in the identification of and the appropriate interventions, accommodations, and teaching techniques for students with dyslexia or a related disorder and to have an understanding of the definition of dyslexia and a working knowledge of several topics relating to dyslexia. This bill is identical to HB 2395.
Title
Public schools; dyslexia advisor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 629 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1516ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Cline, Hodges, Bell, John J. |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senators: Black, Howell, Lucas |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | House requested conference committee |
2017-02-21 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2017-02-20 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1516H1 |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105396D-H1 |
2017-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-13 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105396D-H1 |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1516S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104995D-S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (7-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104995D-S1 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103450D |