VA SB1514 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local regulation of parking of certain vehicles. Adds Leesburg to the towns that are permitted to regulate or prohibit the parking on any public highway of watercraft, boat trailers, motor homes, and camping trailers and to regulate or prohibit the parking of commercial vehicles on any public highway in a residence district.
Title
Parking of certain vehicles; local regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 556 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17 |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1514ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Passed House (93-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103751D |
Subjects
Counties Cities and Towns
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Leesburg Town of
Motor Vehicles
Parking Areas and Regulations
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Leesburg Town of
Motor Vehicles
Parking Areas and Regulations