VA SB151 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commission to Study Slavery and Subsequent De Jure and De Facto Racial and Economic Discrimination Against African Americans; expiration. Extends from July 1, 2022, to July 1, 2024, the expiration of the Commission to Study Slavery and Subsequent De Jure and De Facto Racial and Economic Discrimination Against African Americans. The bill also provides for the nonlegislative citizen members of the Commission to continue to serve for the duration of the extension.
Title
Slavery & Subsqt. De Jure & De Facto Racial & Econ. Discrimination Against African Americans; study.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 587 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB151ER) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103882D |
Same As/Similar To
HB139 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586)
HB139 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586)
HB139 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586)