VA SB1507 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0781)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Use of unmanned aircraft systems by law-enforcement officers; persons sought for arrest. Provides that a law-enforcement officer may deploy an unmanned aircraft system (i) to aerially survey a primary residence of the subject of the arrest warrant to formulate a plan to execute an existing arrest warrant or capias for a felony offense or (ii) to locate a person sought for arrest when such person has fled from a law-enforcement officer and a law-enforcement officer remains in hot pursuit of such person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unmanned aircraft systems; used by law-enforcement officers, persons sought for arrest.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 40-N) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 7-N) (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0781)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 781 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1507ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 40-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House (59-Y 40-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseReported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 7-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
2019-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1507S1
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105749D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-28SenateRead second time
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105749D-S1
2019-01-23SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 4-N 1-A)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101909D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19260.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1507
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1507+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1507S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1507ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0781+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0136+SB1507
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0196SB1507+SB1507
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0227SB1507+SB1507
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0143+SB1507
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0364+SB1507
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3150+SB1507

Bill Comments

feedback