VA SB1507 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0525)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0525)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Safety inspections; appointments. Allows any motor vehicle inspection station to accept appointments for safety inspections in addition to accepting vehicles on a first-come, first-served basis, so long as at least one lane is reserved for the sole purpose of first-come, first-served safety inspections.
Title
Safety inspections; appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0525) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 525 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1507ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Title replaced 17105558D-H1 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1507H1 |
2017-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105558D-H1 |
2017-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105558D-H1 |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (9-Y 4-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103268D |