VA SB1506 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0064)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0064)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Radford University; authority to establish Roanoke Division. Authorizes the Radford University Board of Visitors (the board) to establish the Radford University-Roanoke Division (the Division) through the acquisition of Jefferson College of Health Sciences, a nonprofit private institution wholly owned and operated by Carilion Clinic. The bill authorizes the board, upon establishment of the Division, to (i) exercise the same powers with respect to the operation of the Division as are vested in the board regarding the University and (ii) offer at the Division all programs of instruction offered by Jefferson College of Health Sciences at the time of acquisition, including associate-degree programs. The bill permits Radford University to award merit-based and need-based institutional aid to students enrolled at the Division in a manner that is consistent with practices at the former Jefferson College of Health Sciences. This bill is identical to HB 2181.
Title
Radford University; authority to establish Radford University-Roanoke Division.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0064) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 64 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1506ER) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19105074D-ES1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1506ES1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105074D-S1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105074D-S1 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101884D |