VA SB1506 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0524)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0524)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Applicant Fingerprint Database; Federal Bureau of Investigation records. Authorizes the Department of State Police to submit fingerprints and accompanying records to the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) to be advised through the FBI's Next Generation Identification Rap Back service when an individual subject to a criminal background check as a condition of licensure, certification, employment, or volunteer service with an agency or entity is arrested for, or convicted of, a criminal offense not reported to the Department that would disqualify that individual from such licensure, certification, employment, or volunteer service.
Title
Applicant Fingerprint Database; Federal Bureau of Investigation records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 4-N) (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0524) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 524 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1506ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House (87-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred from Transportation (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17101608D |