VA SB1504 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry; removal of name and identifying information. Creates an additional process for a person required to register on the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry to have his name and information removed from the Registry through a removal request form submitted to the Virginia State Police if such person is required to register for a single Tier I or Tier II misdemeanor offense and otherwise meets certain eligibility criteria. The bill requires the Virginia State Police to remove from the Registry the name of any person and all identifying information within 30 days of receipt of the removal request form upon determining that such person has met the eligibility requirements. Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry; removal of name and identifying information. Creates an additional process for a person required to register on the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry to have his name and information removed from the Registry through a removal request form submitted to the Virginia State Police if such person is required to register for a single Tier I or Tier II misdemeanor offense and otherwise meets certain eligibility criteria. The bill requires the Virginia State Police to remove from the Registry the name of any person and all identifying information within 30 days of receipt of the removal request form upon determining that such person has met the eligibility requirements. The bill directs the Virginia State Police to develop a form for requesting removal from the Registry and make such form available on its website on or before October 1, 2023; such form shall also include information on how to obtain a criminal history record check, the link to the record check form, the cost of the record check, and the address to which the removal request should be returned. The bill also directs the Virginia State Police shall send a letter by first-class mail notifying every person currently on the Registry of the change in the name removal process on or before October 1, 2023. Current law only allows a person to petition the circuit court in which he was convicted or the circuit court in the jurisdiction where he resides for removal of his name and all identifying information from the Registry after such person is eligible.
Title
Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry; removal of name and identifying information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2023-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1504S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23106051D-S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106051D-S1 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 23102255D |