VA SB150 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; ascertainment of results by the electoral board; write-in votes. Changes one of the criteria for determining when an electoral board is required to ascertain the total votes for each write-in candidate for an office from when less than five percent of the total number of votes cast for that office are write-in votes to when less than 10 percent of the total number of votes cast for that office are write-in votes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; ascertainment of results by the electoral board, write-in votes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (6-Y 34-N) (Y: 6 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536)
2018-03-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 536 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President
2018-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-10SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB150ER)
2018-03-10SenateEnrolled
2018-03-08SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (27-Y 13-N)
2018-03-08SenateReconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08SenateTitle replaced 18107379D-H1
2018-03-08SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N)
2018-03-07SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB150H1
2018-03-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18107379D-H1
2018-03-06HouseRead third time
2018-03-05HouseRead second time
2018-03-02HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-03-02HouseCommittee substitute printed 18107379D-H1
2018-02-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-30SenatePrinted as engrossed 18102921D-E
2018-01-30SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
2018-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2018-01-30SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB150E
2018-01-30SenateAmendment by Senator Ebbin agreed to
2018-01-30SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-01-30SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29SenatePassed by for the day
2018-01-29SenateReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29SenateRead third time and defeated by Senate (6-Y 34-N)
2018-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-23SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 4-N)
2017-12-28SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2017-12-28SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102921D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242671(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB150
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB150+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB150E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB150H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB150ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0536+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S08V0038+SB0150
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0131SB0150+SB0150
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0175SB0150+SB0150
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0182SB0150+SB0150
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0207SB0150+SB0150
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0208SB0150+SB0150
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0209SB0150+SB0150
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1803V0014+SB0150
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H18V0125+SB0150
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1305+SB0150
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1072SB0150+SB0150
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1074SB0150+SB0150
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1075SB0150+SB0150

Bill Comments

feedback