VA SB15 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local economic development. Provides that the Virginia income tax net revenue and sales and use tax generated by certain corporations or limited liability companies within a qualified locality be transferred to the qualified locality under certain conditions. A qualified locality is one that (i) has made application to the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority for a Major Employment and Investment Project Site Planning Grant and has been rejected for such grant and (ii) has expended local funds for the economic development purposes specified in the requirements for such grant provided by statute and in guidelines of the Authority. The bill provides that the total amount eligible to be returned to a qualified locality shall not exceed $5 million for any single economic development project.
Title
Economic development, local; transfer of taxes to qualified locality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2017 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-02 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Continued to 2017 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100525D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Counties Cities and Towns
Economic Development
Income Tax
Sales and Use Tax
Taxation
Counties Cities and Towns
Economic Development
Income Tax
Sales and Use Tax
Taxation