VA SB15 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0086)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0086)
Summary
Notice to recipients; earned income tax credit. Requires the Department of Social Services to provide notice of the federal and state earned income tax credit to all recipients of Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF), food stamps, or certain medical assistance. Notice shall be mailed to recipients annually and shall include information on the qualifying income levels, the amount of credit available, the process for applying for the credit, and the availability of assistance in applying for the credit.
Title
Income tax credit, earned; Department of Social Services to provide notice to all applicants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0086) | |
2008-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 86 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-20 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB15ER) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-19 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (67-Y 30-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Passed House (67-Y 30-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-18 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-18 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 10-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB15S1 | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 085698228-S1 | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 085698228-S1 | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 3-N) | |
2007-12-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2007-12-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083110228 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB15 |