VA SB1498 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0671)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0671)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Punitive damages for persons injured by intoxicated drivers; evidence. Extends to blood tests performed by the Department of Forensic Science pursuant to a search warrant the rebuttable presumption in civil cases for punitive damages for injuries caused by intoxicated drivers that provides that a person's blood alcohol level demonstrated by a test performed pursuant to the implied consent statute is at least as high as the driver's blood alcohol level at the time of the accident. The bill further establishes a rebuttable presumption applicable in a civil case for punitive damages for injuries caused by an intoxicated driver that a person who has consumed alcohol knew or should have known that his ability to drive was or would be impaired by such consumption.
Title
Intoxicated drivers; punitive damages for persons injured.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0671) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 671 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1498ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Title replaced 17105587D-H1 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1498H1 |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105587D-H1 |
2017-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105587D-H1 |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17100598D-E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1498E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17100598D |
Subjects
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Criminal Procedure
Drunk Driving
Search Warrants
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Criminal Procedure
Drunk Driving
Search Warrants