VA SB1494 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Firefighters and Emergency Medical Technicians Procedural Guarantee Act; breach of procedures. Prohibits evidence gathered through the conduct of an interrogation that violates the provisions of the Firefighters and Emergency Medical Technicians Procedural Guarantee Act from being admissible in any case against a firefighter or emergency medical services personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighters and Emergency Medical Technicians Procedural Guarantee Act; breach of procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841)
2019-04-03HouseEnacted, Chapter 841 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03SenateReenrolled bill text (SB1494ER2)
2019-04-03SenateReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
2019-03-25SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1494ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Adams, L.R., Miyares, Watts
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Edwards, DeSteph, Suetterlein
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-21SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
2019-02-21SenateReconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1494H1
2019-02-20HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106856D-H1
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106856D-H1
2019-02-15HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1494S1
2019-01-31SenateSubstitute by Senator Edwards agreed to 19106090D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-31SenateCommittee amendments rejected
2019-01-31SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-31SenateFloor substitute printed 19106090D-S1 (Edwards)
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102475D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91302(n/a)See Bill Text
91304(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1494
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1494+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1494S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1494H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1494ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1494ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0841+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0074+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1494+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0296SB1494+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0297SB1494+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0298SB1494+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0071+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0337+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3105+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0939SB1494+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0941SB1494+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0942SB1494+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0998SB1494+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3344+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1113SB1494+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1136SB1494+SB1494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3434+SB1494

Bill Comments

feedback