VA SB1492 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0822)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0822)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Water utilities; consolidated ratemaking. Requires that in any ratemaking proceeding for certain investor-owned water utilities that are part of a water utility network the State Corporation Commission shall ensure that equal fixed and volumetric rates are charged for each customer class of every water utility that is in the water utility network. In such proceeding, the Commission is authorized to aggregate the revenues and costs of the water utilities that are members of the applicable water utility network. In a proceeding implementing these provisions, the Commission is directed to order gradual adjustments to the water utility's rates over an appropriate period.
Title
Water utilities; retail rates of affiliated utilities, definitions, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0822) | |
2017-04-05 | House | Enacted, Chapter 822 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1492ER2) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1492ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1492S1 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104756D-S1 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104756D-S1 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103650D |