VA SB1491 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Public Procurement Act; construction management; contract requirements. Excludes construction management contracts involving infrastructure projects from the requirement that no more than 10 percent of the construction work be performed by the construction manager with its own forces and that the remaining 90 percent of the construction work be performed by subcontractors of the construction manager.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Public Procurement Act; construction management, contract requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
2023-03-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 727 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-23SenateSigned by President
2023-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1491ER)
2023-02-22SenateEnrolled
2023-02-17HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HouseRead third time
2023-02-16HouseRead second time
2023-02-14HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2023-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2023-02-13HouseRead first time
2023-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-07SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1491S1
2023-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23105713D-S1
2023-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-06SenateRead second time
2023-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2023-02-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N)
2023-02-01SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2023-02-01SenateCommittee substitute printed 23105713D-S1
2023-02-01SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2023-01-19SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2023-01-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 23104014D

Same As/Similar To

HB2450 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
HB2450 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224380(n/a)See Bill Text
224381(n/a)See Bill Text
224382(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1491
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1491+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1491S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1491ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0727+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105713D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1491F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1491FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1491FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S12V0108+SB1491
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S05V0283+SB1491
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0243SB1491+SB1491
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0351SB1491+SB1491
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H11V0150+SB1491
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1974+SB1491

Bill Comments

feedback