VA SB1490 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Military and Overseas Voters Act; applying for and casting military-overseas ballots. Requires the Commissioner of Elections to establish and supervise a pilot program to permit an active duty member of a uniformed service who has been called to duty for deployment without access to the United States mail and who is applying for or casting a military-overseas ballot to sign the military-overseas ballot application, the statement of voter accompanying the military-overseas ballot, and any other related documents using his digital signature associated with his Common Access Card issued by the U.S. Department of Defense or any replacement to the Common Access Card issued by the U.S. Department of Defense. The bill also requires the system through which a covered voter may apply for and receive voter registration materials, military-overseas ballots, and other information to be capable of accepting the submission of voted military-overseas ballots cast by any active duty member of a uniformed service who has been called to duty for deployment without access to the United States mail. The bill does not become effective unless an appropriation effectuating the purposes of the bill is included in an appropriation act passed in 2017 by the General Assembly that becomes law. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2019.
Title
Uniform Military and Overseas Voters Act; applying for and casting military-overseas ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17105052D-ES1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1490ES1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105052D-S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105052D-S1 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103867D |