VA SB149 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 602 (effective 7/1/20)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Courthouse and courtroom security; assessment. Increases from $10 to $20 the maximum amount a local governing body may assess against a convicted defendant as part of the costs in a criminal or traffic case in district or circuit court to fund courthouse and courtroom security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courthouse and courtroom security; assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 602 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-04SenateSigned by President
2020-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-03SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB149ER)
2020-03-03SenateEnrolled
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House (81-Y 18-N)
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Public Safety (19-Y 2-N)
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned PS sub: Firearms
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N)
2020-02-04SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N)
2020-01-13SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-13SenateRereferred from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2019-12-18SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2019-12-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101599D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531120(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback