VA SB149 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)
Summary
CRESPA settlement agent; surety bond. Increases the required surety bond under CRESPA from $100,000 to $200,000.
Title
Surety bond; increases amount under CRESPA.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hurt [R] | Sen. Henry Marsh [D] | Sen. Donald McEachin [D] | Sen. Frederick Quayle [R] |
Sen. Roscoe Reynolds [D] | Sen. Walter Stosch [R] | Sen. Richard Stuart [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092) | |
2008-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 92 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-20 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB149ER) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-19 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-04 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080555832 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB149 |